VA SJR85 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-11 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ85ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-11 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ85ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming Governor's appointments; January 18. Confirms appointments of certain persons made by Governor Ralph Northam and communicated to the General Assembly January 18, 2022.
Title
Governor; confirming appointments.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (91-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported without recommendation from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported without recommendation from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ85ER) |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Agree To (91-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-11 | House | Election by House, lines 242-243 (91-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Agree To (93-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Agreed to by House, except lines 242-243 (93-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Taken up |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported without recommendation from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104695D |