VA SJR88 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-15 - Requires 21 affirmative votes for passage
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-15 - Requires 21 affirmative votes for passage
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); the right to a secret ballot. Adds a provision to the Bill of Rights to preserve and protect the right to a secret ballot in elections for office, votes on ballot measures, and votes to designate or authorize employee representation.
Title
Constitutional amendment; right to a secret ballot (first reference).
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan McDougle [R] | Sen. Richard Stuart [R] | Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. Richard Black [R] |
Del. Thomas Garrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Rejected by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Rejected by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-11-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Rejected by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-11-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-15 | Senate | Requires 21 affirmative votes for passage |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Rejected by Senate (20-Y 20-N) |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Rejected by Senate (19-Y 21-N) |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2012-11-26 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 2-N) |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2012-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102630D |