VA SJR91 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ91ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ91ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Virginia's forest products industry.
Title
Commending Virginia's forest products industry.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. Christie New Craig [R] | Sen. Tara Durant [R] | Sen. Emily Brewer [R] |
Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Sen. Tammy Brankley Mulchi [R] | Sen. Mark Peake [R] | Sen. Richard Stuart [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ91ER) |
2024-02-12 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2024-02-09 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2024-02-09 | House | Received |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Presented 24105890D |