VA SJR93 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - House: Tabled in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - House: Tabled in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Study; solitary confinement; report. Directs the Virginia State Crime Commission to study the use of solitary confinement by the Department of Corrections.
Title
Solitary confinement; JLARC to study uses including segregation, isolation, etc., by DOC.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-21 | House: Tabled in Rules by voice vote | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ93S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105360D-S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105360D-S1 | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12104011D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports