VA SJR95 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Commission on Youth; Department of Social Services' administration of the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Program; report. Directs the Commission on Youth to (i) evaluate the Department of Social Services' administration of the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) Program and identify the amount of and reasoning for unused TANF funds; (ii) determine whether TANF funds are being used for the intended purposes of the TANF Program or whether such funds are being diverted to other programs or non-TANF purposes; (iii) determine whether and how TANF funds can be better used to stabilize families economically, help provide educational opportunities, and provide parenting classes and identify other support services that could be made available through TANF funding to strengthen families; and (iv) consult with all relevant stakeholders.
Title
TANF; Commission on Youth to study DSS's administration of Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Rules |
2016-02-22 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16103741D |