AL SB129 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Diversity, equity, and inclusion; certain public entities prohibited from maintaining office that promotes diversity, equity, and inclusion programs; certain programs related to divisive concepts or diversity, equity, and inclusion, prohibited; promotion and endorsement of certain divisive concepts in certain public settings prohibited; exceptions provided; public institution of higher education, required to designate multioccupancy restrooms based on biological sex
Title
Diversity, equity, and inclusion; certain public entities prohibited from maintaining office that promotes diversity, equity, and inclusion programs; certain programs related to divisive concepts or diversity, equity, and inclusion, prohibited; promotion and endorsement of certain divisive concepts in certain public settings prohibited; exceptions provided; public institution of higher education, required to designate multioccupancy restrooms based on biological sex
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - Passed Second House (Y: 75 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Chestnut amendment JMGLFYF-1 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Instrument Change 48A1R3R-1 (Y: 74 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Second House (Y: 75 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Coleman-Madison amendment MVQMW11-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Hatcher amendment Q6WJ144-1 (Y: 5 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Coleman amendment 7LAF22E-1 (Y: 8 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Singleton amendment 36SKVZZ-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Singleton amendment ITHK6W6-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Coleman amendment Q63R151-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Chestnut amendment JMGLFYF-1 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Instrument Change 48A1R3R-1 (Y: 74 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Second House (Y: 75 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Coleman-Madison amendment MVQMW11-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Hatcher amendment Q6WJ144-1 (Y: 5 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Coleman amendment 7LAF22E-1 (Y: 8 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Singleton amendment 36SKVZZ-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Singleton amendment ITHK6W6-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Coleman amendment Q63R151-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Barfoot Motion to Concur - Adopted |
2024-03-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 222 |
2024-03-07 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 220 JMGLFYF-1 |
2024-03-07 | House | Chestnut Amendment Offered JMGLFYF-1 |
2024-03-07 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 219 48A1R3R-1 |
2024-03-07 | House | SG Reported Substitute Offered from House State Government 48A1R3R-1 |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-03-05 | House | Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted 48A1R3R-1 |
2024-03-05 | House | Committee Amendment Adopted TE8M511-1 |
2024-03-05 | House | Committee Amendment Adopted MNZAWH1-1 |
2024-03-05 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-27 | House | Pending House State Government |
2024-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on State Government |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 69 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 68 MVQMW11-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Coleman-Madison Amendment Offered MVQMW11-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Hatcher motion to Adopt - Lost Roll Call 67 Q6WJ144-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Hatcher Amendment Offered Q6WJ144-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Coleman motion to Adopt - Lost Roll Call 66 7LAF22E-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Coleman 2nd Amendment Offered 7LAF22E-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 65 36SKVZZ-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Singleton 2nd Amendment Offered 36SKVZZ-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 64 ITHK6W6-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered ITHK6W6-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Barfoot motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 63 Q63R151-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | C&MG Amendment Offered Q63R151-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted Q63R151-1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Pending Senate County and Municipal Government |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government |