AR HB1158 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Notification that HB1158 is now Act 289
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Notification that HB1158 is now Act 289
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Correction - Holiday Compensation Supplemental Appropriation.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Correction - Holiday Compensation Supplemental Appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Notification that HB1158 is now Act 289 |
2014-03-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2014-03-12 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2014-03-12 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2014-03-11 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2014-03-11 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2014-03-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2014-03-07 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2014-03-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2014-03-06 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2014-03-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2014-03-04 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2014-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2014-03-04 | House | Motion to reconsider Amendment #1 passed. |
2014-03-03 | House | Amendment No. 1 failed of adoption. |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2014-02-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2014-02-20 | House | Filed |