AR HB1741 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow For Reduction Of Regulation By Cities In Unincorporated Areas Of Counties.
Title
To Allow For Reduction Of Regulation By Cities In Unincorporated Areas Of Counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Rep. Ratliff, J served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which HB1741 Failed to Pass - 04/12/2013 01:52:22 PM (Y: 64 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Rep. Ratliff, J served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which HB1741 Failed to Pass - 04/12/2013 01:52:22 PM (Y: 64 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned From the Senate having failed to pass. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Returned To the House as Having Failed to Pass. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read third time and failed to pass. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-12 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2013-04-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-12 | House | Rep. Ratliff, J served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which HB1741 Failed to Pass - 04/12/2013 01:52:22 PM |
2013-04-11 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-04-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-09 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |