AR SB1 | 2024 | 94th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Notification that SB1 is now Act 32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Notification that SB1 is now Act 32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Arkansas Senate Appropriation For The 2024-2025 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Arkansas Senate Appropriation For The 2024-2025 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Notification that SB1 is now Act 32 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2024-04-17 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2024-04-17 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2024-04-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2024-04-16 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Filed |