AR SB343 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Create An Exemption From The Sales And Uses Taxes For Materials Used To Bale, Package, Tie, Wrap, Or Seal Animal Feed Products.
Title
To Create An Exemption From The Sales And Uses Taxes For Materials Used To Bale, Package, Tie, Wrap, Or Seal Animal Feed Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-04-27 | House Returned to the Senate at Sine Die Adjournment | |
2011-03-31 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE | |
2011-03-31 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Filed |