AR SCR4 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Adopt The Joint Rules Of The Senate And The House Of Representatives Of The Eighty-eighth General Assembly.
Title
To Adopt The Joint Rules Of The Senate And The House Of Representatives Of The Eighty-eighth General Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Rules, Resolutions and Memorials | |
2011-02-03 | Senate As Amended #1 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Returned From the House as concurred in. | |
2011-02-03 | House Returned To Senate concurred in. | |
2011-02-03 | House Read the third time, concurred in as amended #1, ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-02 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-01 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-02-01 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-02-01 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-01-31 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Select Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-31 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Read the third time and adopted. | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SCR4 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Bills/SCR4.pdf |