AZ HB2115 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Chapter 237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Chapter 237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployed; severance pay; definition
Title
Unemployed; severance pay; definition
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Chapter 237 | |
2014-04-25 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-21 | House | House final reading , voting: (35-20-5-0) |
2014-04-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-10-2-0) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-2-0) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-04 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-21-4-0) |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-02-10 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |