AZ HB2838 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 425
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 425
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; partnerships; S corporations
Title
Income tax; partnerships; S corporations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Chapter 425 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (44-14-2-0) |
2021-06-30 | House | House concurs |
2021-06-30 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-06-30 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-06-29 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0) |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-4-0) |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-11 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Credit (h)
Effective Date
Entity-level Tax Election (h)
Income Tax
Income Tax Credits
Partnership
Partnerships (h)
Purpose
Retroactivity
S Corporations
Taxation Of Income (h)
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Effective Date
Entity-level Tax Election (h)
Income Tax
Income Tax Credits
Partnership
Partnerships (h)
Purpose
Retroactivity
S Corporations
Taxation Of Income (h)
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 1014 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1075 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 581 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |