AZ SB1274 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 75
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 75
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Professional regulatory boards; composition
Title
Professional regulatory boards; composition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Senate | Chapter 75 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-05-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2020-05-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-05-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-05-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-05-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-09 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-1-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Board Of Accountancy
Board Of Barbers
Board Of Cosmetology
Board Of Funeral Directors And Embalmers
Board Of Massage Therapy
Board Of Technical Registration
Members
Occupational Regulatory Boards
Professional Regulatory Boards
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Regulatory Boards
Board Of Barbers
Board Of Cosmetology
Board Of Funeral Directors And Embalmers
Board Of Massage Therapy
Board Of Technical Registration
Members
Occupational Regulatory Boards
Professional Regulatory Boards
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Regulatory Boards
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 4202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |