AZ SB1425 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Securities; salesmen; registration exemptions
Title
Securities; salesmen; registration exemptions
Sponsors
Sen. David Farnsworth [R] | Rep. Andrea Dalessandro [D] | Sen. Steve Farley [D] | Sen. Andrew Sherwood [D] |
Sen. Bob Worsley [R] | Rep. John Allen [R] | Rep. Jeff Weninger [R] | Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Banking and Financial Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate Financial Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Banking and Financial Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate Financial Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Chapter 329 | |
2016-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-07 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (29-26-5-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-03-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House BFS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to House BFS Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | Assigned to House BFS Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate FI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate FI Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FI Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |