AZ SB1850 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2913
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Chapter 401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Chapter 401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reviser's technical corrections; 2021.
Title
Reviser's technical corrections; 2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1850 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1850 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 401 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-06-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-2-0) |
2021-06-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1850 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2913 (Replaces) 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2913 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Subjects
2021
Defective And Conflicting
Director Of The Department Of Insurance And Financial Institutions
Insurance - Title 20
Legislative Dispositions
Multiple, Defective And Conflicting Legislative Disposition Of Statutory Text
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Purpose
Qualifying Health Information Exchange Organization
Repeal
Retroactivity
Reviser's Technical Corrections
State Government - Title 41
Statutory Text
Defective And Conflicting
Director Of The Department Of Insurance And Financial Institutions
Insurance - Title 20
Legislative Dispositions
Multiple, Defective And Conflicting Legislative Disposition Of Statutory Text
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Purpose
Qualifying Health Information Exchange Organization
Repeal
Retroactivity
Reviser's Technical Corrections
State Government - Title 41
Statutory Text
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 321.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 3201 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |