CA AB1775 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 26200 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis: retail preparation, sale, and consumption of noncannabis food and beverage products.
Sponsors
Asm. Matt Haney [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 17). |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (April 2). |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and G.O. |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |