CA ACR185 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 6).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 6).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Mental Health Awareness Month.
Title
Mental Health Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-04-26 | Assembly | From printer. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |