CA SB1000 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 35.5 (commencing with Section 22948.30) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 6320 of the Family Code, relating to connected devices.
Title
Connected devices: device protection requests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1000 Ashby et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3725.) (April 23). |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22948.30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 6320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |