CO HR1005 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changes to the rules of the House of Representatives regarding access to documents related to a complaint under the Workplace Harassment Policy.
Title
Access to Workplace Harassment Complaint Documents
Sponsors
Rep. Julie McCluskie [D] | Rep. Rose Pugliese [R] | Rep. Monica Duran [D] | Rep. Shannon Bird [D] |
Rep. Kyle Brown [D] | Rep. Cathy Kipp [D] | Rep. Brianna Titone [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-03-13 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |