CT HB05271 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make changes to the Connecticut Siting Council's procedures, including those related to the siting of certain facilities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Siting Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 424 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 151 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 151 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-31 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Public Act 12-165 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Calendar Number 459 | |
2012-05-02 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-30 | House Passed | |
2012-04-20 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-20 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |
2012-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-20 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-17 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | |
2012-04-11 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-11 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-04 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-20 | File Number 55 | |
2012-03-20 | House Calendar Number 76 | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-03-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-09 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-09 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-02-24 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |