CT HB05320 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To amend requirements concerning the posting of bonds and other surety for the completion of public improvements on approved site plans and subdivisions, and to prohibit municipalities from regulating the issuance of building permits for structures built pursuant to an approved site plan or subdivision and located on a lot abutting an unaccepted highway or street.
Title
An Act Concerning Bonds And Other Surety For Approved Site Plans And Subdivisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 401 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-06-01 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Public Act 12-182 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | Rules Suspended | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Calendar Number 540 | |
2012-05-09 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-09 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4055 | |
2012-04-11 | File Number 349 | |
2012-04-11 | House Calendar Number 275 | |
2012-04-11 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-04 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-23 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-02-27 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |
2012-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |