CT HB05331 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) prohibit the Commissioner of Motor Vehicles from suspending a license solely for failing to pay fines, fees or other charges resulting from a motor vehicle infraction or violation or for failure to appear for any scheduled court appearance with regard to any such infraction or violation, and (2) restore the operator's license of any person whose license was suspended for such failure.
Title
An Act Concerning The Suspension Of Motor Vehicle Operators' Licenses For Failure To Pay Fines Or Fees Or Failure To Appear For A Scheduled Court Appearance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-12 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-12 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-04 | House | File Number 275 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 192 |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-29 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |