CT HB05382 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Child Advocate to review the statutes, policies and procedures of the Department of Children and Families.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Office Of The Child Advocate.
Sponsors
House Committee on Children | Rep. Jane Garibay [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] |
Rep. Martin Foncello [R] | Sen. Lisa Seminara [R] | Sen. Jeff Gordon [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 286 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 33 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 33 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-22 | House | Public Act 24-126 |
2024-05-08 | House | In Concurrence |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-22 | Senate | File Number 605 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 342 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-18 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3881 |
2024-03-27 | House | File Number 152 |
2024-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 131 |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |