CT HB05398 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - File Number 636
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - File Number 636
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require a study of the use of communication systems by public safety personnel and the sharing of private information.
Title
An Act Requiring A Study Of Communication Systems Used By Public Safety Personnel And Privacy Concerns.
Sponsors
House Public Safety and Security Committee | Rep. Eleni Kavros DeGraw [D] | Rep. William Pizzuto [R] | Rep. Tom O'Dea [R] |
Rep. Irene Haines [R] | Rep. Martin Foncello [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 81 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | File Number 636 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 392 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-29 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B,C,D,E |
2024-04-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule E 4457 |
2024-04-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule D 4456 |
2024-04-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 4455 |
2024-04-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 4450 |
2024-04-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4588 |
2024-04-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Public Health |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health |
2024-04-03 | House | File Number 240 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 181 |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |