CT HB06001 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-13)
Status: Passed on August 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-12 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-13)
Status: Passed on August 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-12 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning Telehealth.
Title
An Act Concerning Telehealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 49 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 49 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 14 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 49 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 14 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-12 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2020-08-07 | Senate | Public Act 20-2 |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor |
2020-07-28 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2020-07-23 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2020-07-23 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3763 |
2020-07-23 | House | Emergency Certification |