CT HB06224 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide that certain nonprofit organizations that operate drop-in programs for children shall be exempt from the state's child day care licensure requirements.
Title
An Act Exempting Certain Nonprofit Organizations That Operate Drop-in Programs For Children From The State's Child Day Care Licensure Requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 531 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 224 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 224 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-193 | |
2011-06-08 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-02 | File Number 880 | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Calendar Number 610 | |
2011-06-02 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-06-01 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2011-06-01 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-01 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7427 | |
2011-04-18 | File Number 549 | |
2011-04-18 | House Calendar Number 334 | |
2011-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-18 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-11 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-04-01 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-01 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-10 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-03-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-03 | Joint Favorable PH | |
2011-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children | |
2011-02-16 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |