CT SB00120 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the use of chlorpyrifos on golf courses and for nonagricultural use and to restrict the use of neonicotinoids for nonagricultural use.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Chlorpyrifos On Golf Courses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 381 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 228 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 164 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 228 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 164 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-26 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-26 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-19 | House | Public Act 22-142 |
2022-05-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | House | Rules Suspended |
2022-05-04 | House | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6505 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 439 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5101 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-22 | Senate | File Number 68 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 82 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |