CT SB00133 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Define various terms for purposes of the Pharmacy Practice Act and related statutes; (2) provide for advanced pharmacy technician endorsements and the registration of clerks; (4) authorize pharmacists and advanced pharmacy technicians to dispense drugs in compliance packaging; (5) empower the Commission of Pharmacy to take disciplinary action against certain persons who accept, for return to general inventory or regular stock, any drug that has been sold or delivered to a patient; (6) provide that an individual who is enrolled in an accredited pharmacy technician education program may, in certain circumstances, act as a pharmacy technician; (7) enable the department to take certain actions concerning pharmacy technicians without authorization by the commission; (8) provide that a pharmacist may order and administer certain vaccines; and (9) make minor, technical and conforming changes to various statutes concerning regulation of prescription drugs and related professions.
Title
An Act Concerning Regulation Of Prescription Drugs And Related Professions.
Sponsors
House General Law Committee | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Tracy Marra [R] |
Rep. Irene Haines [R] | Rep. Farley Santos [D] | Rep. William Pizzuto [R] | Rep. Donna Veach [R] |
Rep. Francis Cooley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 238 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 109 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 109 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2024-05-08 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-08 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 421 |
2024-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4165 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | File Number 89 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 78 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |