CT SB00333 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To remove prohibitions against a municipality modifying certain local charter provisions pertaining to (1) planning and zoning commissions, (2) the process of eminent domain, and (3) the disposition of municipal property.
Title
An Act Concerning Local Charter Revisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 202 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 192 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 192 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2024-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-07 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-04 | House | House Calendar Number 485 |
2024-05-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-05-03 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5647 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | File Number 387 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 249 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |