CT SB00999 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To set forth the responsibility for prehospital patient care management, establish fines for emergency medical services organizations that fail to submit required data and make conforming changes to the statutes to reflect the reorganization of emergency medical services personnel.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations Regarding Emergency Medical Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 315 AS AMENDED (Y: 105 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 187 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 187 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Public Act 15-223 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-15 | Senate | House Calendar Number 568 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7055 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | File Number 709 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 420 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |