CT SB01039 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify the status of the State Education Resource Center as a nonstock corporation and nonprofit tax exempt organization within the Department of Education; to allow certain medical professionals from military bases who are not licensed by the state to conduct health assessments in schools; to eliminate an expenditure requirement for regional educational service centers and the requirement that regional educational service centers collect and analyze data on school efforts to reduce racial, ethnic and economic isolation; to eliminate the requirement that superintendents submit data on the reduction of racial, ethnic and economic isolation in the district to the regional educational service center and instead submit such data directly to the Commissioner of Education; to require that a teacher maintain a valid J-1 Visa issued by the United States Department of State as a condition of renewal of an international teacher permit; to delete obsolete provisions relating to the minimum expenditure requirement; to allow for prior year adjustments to magnet school operating grants recovery of funds when audits reveal an overpayment by the state; and to increase the term of members of the Department of Education's arbitration panel from two years to four years.
Title
An Act Concerning Education Issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 376 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 225 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 225 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-179 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-23 | House Calendar Number 546 | |
2011-05-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-20 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-20 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6612 | |
2011-04-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-20 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |
2011-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-19 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-03-21 | File Number 111 | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Calendar Number 108 | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-21 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-03 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-02 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-02-24 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |