CT SB01173 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To place public university start-up companies on a level playing field with other businesses seeking preseed funding from Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated.
Title
An Act Concerning Qualified Private Investments For Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated's Preseed Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 337 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 228 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 228 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-218 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed | |
2011-05-23 | House Calendar Number 549 | |
2011-05-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-20 | Senate Passed | |
2011-05-11 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-11 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-05-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-05 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-27 | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |
2011-04-26 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-26 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-21 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |
2011-04-06 | File Number 433 | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Calendar Number 242 | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-06 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-22 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-11 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |