DC B20-1046 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Critical Infrastructure Freedom Of Information Third Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2014
Title
Critical Infrastructure Freedom Of Information Third Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-12-30 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 14, 2015 |
2014-12-17 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2014-12-16 | Council | B20-1046 Introduced by Councilmember McDuffie at Office of the Secretary |