DC B23-0501 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0573 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0573 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-501 limits the District's cooperation with federal immigration agencies absent a judicial warrant or order.
Title
Sanctuary Values Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment (C. Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0573 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001103 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0573 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Amendment (C. Allen) |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-12-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-24 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-23 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0501 |
2020-10-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-12 | Council | Oversight Hearing Held |
2020-03-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-10-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0501 Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |