DC B23-0965 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0591 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0591 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
BILL SMMARY - As introduced Bill 23-965 adds a new section to provide eligible workers who have been displaced by COVID-19 the opportunity to be reinstated once their employer reopens after the pandemic.
Title
Displaced Workers Right to Reinstatement and Retention Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Council - Oral Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Oral Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0591 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001177 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0591 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-12-15 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2020-12-15 | Council | Oral Amendment (Mendelson) |
2020-12-11 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-12-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-12-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0965 |
2020-11-04 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-10-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0965 Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-10-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |