DC B25-0356 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Act A25-0461 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 005032
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Act A25-0461 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 005032
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-356 would allow the Mayor to continue to delegate the functions of repealed section 6B of the District of Columbia Applications Insurance Implementation Act to the Director of the Department of Energy and Environment.
Title
Floodplain Review Authority Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Council | Act A25-0461 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 005032 |
2024-04-30 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Jun 18, 2024 |
2024-04-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-04-25 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0461 |
2024-04-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-04-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-03-05 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2024-03-05 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0356 |
2024-01-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-12-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-07-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0356 Published in the DC Register |
2023-07-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-06-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |