DC B25-0692 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Public Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Public Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-692 would broaden the pool of qualified healthcare professionals authorized to initiate involuntary commitment processes, incorporating Psychiatric-Mental Health Nurse Practitioners with expertise in mental health assessments. It extends the detention time for emergency observation. It extends timeframes for initiation of probable cause hearings and prioritizes virtual hearings. It clarifies the right to voluntarily agree to remain in inpatient status until an appropriate discharge plan is implemented. It would allow doctors to make involuntary admissions, provided their financial arrangements comply with federal law. It allows the court, when appropriate to order for treatment for up to 30 days but not less than 15 days. It would also require the Department of Behavioral Health to develop online training modules for both healthcare professionals and laypersons.
Title
Enhancing Mental Health Crisis Support and Hospitalization Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | Council | Public Hearing |
2024-04-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0692 Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2024-02-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0692 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54746/Introduction/B25-0692-Introduction.pdf |