DC B25-0783 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-783 would authorize the Business Improvements District Council to enter a master license agreement with a third-party provider for the deployment of interactive wayfinding kiosks in commercial areas served by business improvement district corporations.
Title
Business Improvement District Resiliency Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-04-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0783 Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2024-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0783 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/55136/Introduction/B25-0783-Introduction.pdf |