DC B25-0792 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Public Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Public Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-792 would eliminate the requirement for a notary public to read and write in the language of any record on which the notary public performs a notarial act. It also clarifies that the training course for notary applicants must be approved but not provided by the Mayor and also requires notarial officers to read and write in the same language as the notarial certificate executed by the officer.
Title
Notarial Acts Clarification Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-10 | Council | Public Hearing |
2024-05-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0792 Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Executive Administration and Labor |
2024-04-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0792 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/55220/Introduction/B25-0792-Introduction.pdf |