DE SB221 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Assigned to Administration Committee in House
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Assigned to Administration Committee in House
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides that the next of kin of a deceased police officer, member of a fire department, or member of the Delaware National Guard is entitled to a Delaware state flag if the deceased person served in at least 1 qualifying entity for at least 10 years and died in the line of duty or while an active member.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Provision Of A Flag To Next Of Kin.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2024-04-24 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-04-24 | Amendment SA 2 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-04-24 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Stricken in Senate | |
2024-04-23 | Amendment SA 2 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-04-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2024-04-16 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-04-11 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 221, and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |