FL H0591 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Chapter No. 2024-66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Chapter No. 2024-66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates month of April as "Hot Car Death Prevention Month"; encourages specified entities to sponsor events to promote public awareness on dangers of leaving child unattended in motor vehicle & provide methods to prevent hot car deaths.
Title
Hot Car Death Prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#629 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Transportation & Modals Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#629 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Transportation & Modals Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Chapter No. 2024-66 | |
2024-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-03-27 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-02-21 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-02-21 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2024-02-21 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 554 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2024-02-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-15 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-15 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024) |
2024-02-08 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2024-01-31 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | Favorable by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-25 | House | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-24 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-11-30 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2023-11-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S554 (Similar To) 2024-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 591