FL H0951 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Chapter No. 2014-240, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 949 (Ch. 2014-239)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Chapter No. 2014-240, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 949 (Ch. 2014-239)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Merges East Naples Fire Control & Rescue District & Golden Gate Fire Control & Rescue District, Collier County, to create new district; creates & establishes independent special fire control district to be known as Greater Naples Fire Rescue District; provides that district is independent special district; provides legislative intent; provides for applicability of chapters 191 & 189, F.S., & other general laws; provides district charter; provides boundaries; provides for district board; creates exception to general law; provides authority of board; provides for staff; provides duties & powers of board; provides for elections to board; provides for salaries of board members; provides for removal of board members; provides savings clause for existing district authority to levy up to 1.5 mills; provides for bonds; provides for raising of revenue; provides for taxation; provides findings; provides for impact fees; provides for collection & disbursement of such fees; provides for deposit of taxes, assessments, & fees & authority to disburse funds; provides for immunity from tort liability; provides for liberal construction; provides for severability; provides that this act shall take precedence over any conflicting law to extent of such conflict; provides for determination of millage; repeals chapters 2000-392, 2012-231, 2004-433, & 2000-444, LOF, relating to East Naples Fire Control & Rescue District & Golden Gate Fire Control & Rescue District; transfers all assets & liabilities of existing districts to Greater Naples Fire Rescue District; requires referendum.
Title
Collier County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#711 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#711 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | Chapter No. 2014-240, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 949 (Ch. 2014-239) | |
2014-05-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-05-08 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-29 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 04/29/14 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2014-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-25 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14 |
2014-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable by- Finance and Tax Subcommittee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-28 | House | CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2014-03-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Subcommittee, 04/01/14, 2:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2014-03-28 | House | Now in Finance and Tax Subcommittee |
2014-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-27 | House | CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/27/14, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Finance and Tax Subcommittee |
2014-02-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1286 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2014-240), CS/HB 949 (Ch. 2014-239)
H0949 (Related) 2014-06-25 - Chapter No. 2014-239, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2014-240)
S1186 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 949 (Ch. 2014-239), CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2014-240)
H0949 (Related) 2014-06-25 - Chapter No. 2014-239, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2014-240)
S1186 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 949 (Ch. 2014-239), CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2014-240)