FL S0720 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the information required to be included in a sworn information form for asbestos or silica claims filed after a specified date; specifying that such a form is inadmissible in evidence, and may not be relied upon by a witness, at trial; requiring courts to dismiss certain claims upon a motion by a defendant, etc.
Title
Asbestos and Silica Claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Messages |
2024-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-04 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 29 NAYS 6 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (832146) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 5 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/21/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Rules |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Commerce and Tourism |
2024-02-06 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1367 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar