FL S1046 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from falsely personating any personnel or representative from the Florida Gaming Control Commission; increasing the criminal penalty for specified violations involving a slot machine or device; providing requirements for notice of violations; prohibiting a person from making false statements or disseminating false information regarding the legality of a slot machine or device to facilitate the sale or delivery of such device; prohibiting a person from, for profit or hire, transporting or procuring the transportation of a specified number of other persons to facilitate illegal gambling, etc.
Title
Gaming Control
Sponsors
Senate Fiscal Policy Committee | Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | Sen. Jonathan Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Messages |
2024-02-28 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-28 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 31 NAYS 7 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (800088, 898240) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time 509 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 13 NAYS 4 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-13 | Senate | CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/08/24, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 5 NAYS 2 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/16/24, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H189 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
772 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
843 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 157 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
895 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |