FL S1784 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-222
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-222
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund to acquire certain nonconservation lands to buffer a military installation against encroachment; authorizing the Department of Economic Opportunity to annually recommend nonconservation lands for acquisition through fee simple purchase or less-than-fee interest purchase to the board of trustees for the purpose of preventing the encroachment of military installations; requiring the board of trustees to also consider land acquisition recommendations of the Florida Defense Support Task Force, etc.
Title
Military Installations
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] | Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security Committee |
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#356 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Chapter No. 2013-222 | |
2013-06-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed; YEAS 119 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-29 | House | Substituted for HB 7101 |
2013-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-26 | House | Received |
2013-04-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13 |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (824856) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/13 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/16/13 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by- Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/09/13, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 04/02/13, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-18 | Senate | SPB 7028 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1784) by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security |
Same As/Similar To
H7101 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1784 (Ch. 2013-222)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
253 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 980 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |