GA HB1179 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 31-7-18 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to influenza vaccinations for discharged patients aged 65 and older, vaccinations or other measures for health care workers in hospitals, immunity from liability, and standing orders, so as to require hospitals to annually offer influenza vaccinations and other measures to its health care workers and other employees; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Influenza vaccinations; hospitals offer annually to employees; require
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Sen. Johnny Grant [R] | Rep. Howard Mosby [D] |
Rep. Nikki Randall [D] | Rep. Barbara Sims [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #737 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-27 | Act 486 | |
2010-05-27 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-09 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-09 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-16 | House First Readers |