GA HB1233 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 2 of Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the jurisdiction, powers, and duties, generally, of the Georgia Public Service Commission, so as to provide that the certain costs sustained by the Public Service Commission shall be charged to the involved utility; to provide that such cost may be included in any approved rate increase; to provide for certain limits on the amount that can be charged to the utility; to provide for commission review of certain invoices; to provide that the utility can recoup certain costs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Public Service Commission; certain costs charged to involved utility; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Beardon [R] | Rep. Tyrone Brooks [D] | Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] | Rep. John Lunsford [R] |
Rep. Howard Mosby [D] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #795 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 370 | |
2010-05-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-10 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-24 | House Notice To Reconsider | |
2010-03-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-17 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-16 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2010-03-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-08 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-18 | House First Readers |