GA HB130 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective Date 2024-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective Date 2024-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Student Finance Authority, so as to provide for student loan repayment for peace officers; to provide for definitions; to provide for eligibility requirements; to provide for continued eligibility requirements; to provide for student loan repayment agreements and conditions; to provide for maximum student loan repayment amounts; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for appropriations contingency; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Student Finance Authority; student loan repayment for peace officers; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] |
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Yasmin Neal [D] | Sen. Bo Hatchett [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #432 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #442 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #115 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #442 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #115 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Effective Date 2024-05-01 | |
2024-05-01 | Act 514 | |
2024-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-02-06 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2023-01-30 | House | House Hopper |