GA HB336 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Regulated Industries and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Regulated Industries and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 8-2-23 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to amendment and revision of codes generally, so as to prohibit the Georgia state minimum standard codes from prohibiting the use of certain refrigerants; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Buildings and housing; prohibit Georgia state minimum standard codes from prohibiting use of certain refrigerants
Sponsors
Rep. Brent Cox [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] |
Rep. Victor Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #117 (Y: 162 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-09 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64218 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/214224 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64218#21124 |